U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arteaga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.