U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Minter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 17, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 21, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Transcript]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 11, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 10, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2017: [Dismiss ]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 12, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Seal]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extension of Time]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2016
  • February 15, 2016: [Extension of Time]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 14, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 13, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 13, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 07, 2015: [Extension of Time]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.