U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 05, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 18, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 10, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 10, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 15, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 13, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 10, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 10, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.