U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yalincak et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 29, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 04, 2020: [Extension of Time]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 11, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 07, 2020: [Extension of Time]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 08, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 22, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • January 02, 2019: [Extension of Time]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 11, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2018: [Extension of Time]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 19, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 01, 2015: [Reply to Response]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2015: [Status Conference]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
May, 2015
  • May 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.