U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yalincak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 11, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 07, 2020: [Extension of Time]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 22, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 02, 2019: [Extension of Time]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 14, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 07, 2018: [Extension of Time]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 19, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [USCA Request]
  • February 02, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 01, 2015: [Reply to Response]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2015: [Reply to Response]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.