U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guarraci
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 03, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 03, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 24, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 21, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 20, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 13, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 25, 2015: [Transcript]
  • July 09, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2015
  • May 18, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.