U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 22, 2022: [Seal]
  • July 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [2255 Motion Filed]
November, 2016
  • November 13, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 31, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 31, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • April 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 10, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 10, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 13, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 04, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 22, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2015
  • May 20, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.