U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • August 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 19, 2016: [Violation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Payment]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • March 04, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • March 03, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order]
  • February 18, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 18, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 20, 2015: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Bond]
  • June 18, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2015
  • May 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.