U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. UBS AG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 10, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 10, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Order]
May, 2015
  • May 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.