U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 10, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • January 10, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 09, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Departure]
  • December 07, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Status Conference]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 21, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Certificate of Good Standing]
May, 2015
  • May 21, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.