U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cave
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 05, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 22, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 22, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 16, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 26, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 26, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 09, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2015
  • May 21, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.