U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nicolescu et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 15, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 16, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 17, 2016: [Travel ]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 21, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
May, 2015
  • May 22, 2015: [2255 Motion Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.