U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lonergan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 05, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 05, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 15, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 15, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 17, 2017: [Clerk's Disbursement of Funds]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Bond]
  • January 09, 2017: [Bond]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 22, 2016: [Instrument Returned]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • November 07, 2016: [Return of Passport]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 12, 2016: [Travel ]
  • October 11, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2016: [Payment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 30, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 29, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 01, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 22, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Extension of Time]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Payment]
  • May 24, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • May 24, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 20, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 23, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • April 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 20, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Travel ]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 29, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • February 29, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 22, 2016: [Extension of Time]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Travel ]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2016: [Update Certificate of Good Standing Deadline]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 07, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Transcript]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 11, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 02, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 02, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • December 02, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 02, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 02, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [Transcript]
  • November 17, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 13, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 13, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • November 13, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2015: [Travel ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order]
  • November 02, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
  • October 05, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 27, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 27, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • July 01, 2015: [Travel ]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2015
  • May 22, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.