U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00081-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Uzar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Passport Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 27, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 23, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • December 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 28, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 28, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 24, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 18, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 15, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 11, 2020: [Seal]
  • September 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 11, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 23, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 01, 2019: [Passport Returned]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 25, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 10, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 11, 2017: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 29, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 29, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 27, 2016: [Unseal Document]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 30, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2016: [Passport Returned]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 25, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • March 25, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 25, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2015
  • May 22, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.