U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kasparek
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 20, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 14, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • August 14, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 11, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 11, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 11, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2015
  • May 22, 2015: [Compliance Review Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.