U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quesada
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 27, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 06, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 30, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • November 30, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • November 07, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 15, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 18, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 02, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 02, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 02, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • September 02, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 13, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 25, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2015
  • May 22, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.