U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Restitution Order]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 25, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 07, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 26, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 26, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 21, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2015
  • May 26, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.