U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aquart et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 05, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 01, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 29, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • October 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2021: [Document Unsealed]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • October 25, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 08, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 08, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • October 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 16, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • July 16, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 28, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • June 01, 2021: [Dismiss ]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Transcript]
  • September 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • September 17, 2020: [Status Report]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • July 15, 2020: [ExParte Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Compel ]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • December 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 04, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 24, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2015
  • June 01, 2015: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.