U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hebert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 05, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 05, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 18, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 18, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 26, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 26, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 02, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Continue ]
  • June 04, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.