U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00248-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Narducci
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 07, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 16, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 13, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • June 13, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 05, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.