U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2022: [Violation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 29, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 23, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • April 15, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • April 05, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 13, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 01, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 26, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • January 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Status Conference]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Order]
  • July 21, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Order]
  • June 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.