U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 15, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 08, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 08, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Continue ]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 28, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 27, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 27, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 27, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 24, 2017: [Violation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 10, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 09, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 09, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 08, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • June 12, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.