U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 13, 2015: [Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 27, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 23, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 21, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 15, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • October 15, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • October 01, 2015: [Exhibit]
September, 2015
  • September 26, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 07, 2015: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order]
  • August 11, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 06, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 26, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • June 15, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • June 15, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 15, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 15, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • June 15, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • June 15, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 15, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 15, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.