U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 21, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 21, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 13, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 20, 2015: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • July 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 16, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • June 16, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 16, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.