U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Passport Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [USCA Request]
  • August 13, 2015: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.