U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tirado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 13, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 09, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 29, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 22, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 20, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 19, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
  • July 28, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.