U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 20, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 20, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 13, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 19, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 06, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 03, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 29, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 03, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 06, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Order]
  • August 13, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 15, 2015: [Bond]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • July 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 14, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 04, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.