U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00103-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 27, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2021
  • September 18, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2020: [Violation Report]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • February 13, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 10, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 13, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 11, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 26, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • April 25, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 14, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 07, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 14, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • March 01, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 26, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 13, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Bond]
  • January 11, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 11, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 06, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 26, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 21, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 17, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 17, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2016: [Bond]
  • November 17, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • November 17, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order]
  • May 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 16, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 27, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 13, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • February 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2016: [Status Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 23, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 10, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2015
  • October 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 30, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 30, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 29, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 24, 2015: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 20, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order]
  • August 13, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 10, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • August 06, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 06, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 06, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 04, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order]
  • July 29, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.