U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00102-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Zayas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 07, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 07, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 05, 2017: [Dismiss ]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 08, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 07, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 26, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 26, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 13, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
  • June 08, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 30, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 24, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 17, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 17, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 29, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 28, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 03, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 09, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Transcript]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • October 06, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 17, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 14, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 16, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 13, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Witness List]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 18, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 31, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • March 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 16, 2016: [Bond]
  • March 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • February 16, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 16, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • February 04, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 04, 2016: [Bond]
  • February 02, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 06, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 06, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • January 05, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2016: [Extension of Time]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 04, 2015: [Transcript]
  • December 02, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • December 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2015: [Suppress]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 26, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • August 12, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 05, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 04, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 14, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • July 14, 2015: [Bond]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 25, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • June 24, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.