U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Serrano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 02, 2015: [Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 06, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 08, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • September 08, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • September 08, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.