U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 20, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order of Transfer]
  • June 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 18, 2018: [Violation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 10, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 03, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 03, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Arrest ]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 27, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2016: [Transcript]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2016: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 11, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • July 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 18, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Departure]
  • May 17, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 17, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 10, 2016: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Remark]
  • April 25, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 13, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 13, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 10, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 10, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 17, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 17, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 17, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 04, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 26, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 25, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 25, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 25, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 25, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 25, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 07, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 06, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • July 15, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 07, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 19, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.