U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00105-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 02, 2019: [Violation Report]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 15, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 19, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 14, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 11, 2019: [Violation Report]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 14, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 28, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 21, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • February 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 13, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 06, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 06, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • March 03, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 27, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 27, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 16, 2017: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 26, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 26, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 18, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continue ]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 30, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 23, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 19, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 19, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • December 07, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Remark]
  • November 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 03, 2016: [Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 28, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • October 28, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
  • October 21, 2016: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • October 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 12, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • August 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2016: [Bond]
July, 2016
  • July 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 20, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order]
  • July 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Remark]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 06, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 14, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 14, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • April 11, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • April 11, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 06, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 01, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 31, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 24, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 19, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • February 16, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • February 10, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • February 03, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 28, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Giglio Material]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • January 25, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 20, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 12, 2016: [Produce ]
  • January 12, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • January 12, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 06, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • January 05, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2016: [New Trial]
  • January 04, 2016: [Suppress]
  • January 04, 2016: [Strike ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Giglio Material]
  • January 04, 2016: [In Limine ]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 06, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 04, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 03, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Speedy Trial]
  • October 26, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 09, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • July 07, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 19, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • June 18, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.