U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 10, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 10, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • October 06, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 01, 2016: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Witness List]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 24, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 24, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 23, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 23, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 16, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 16, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 15, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Speedy Trial]
  • July 28, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 27, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 27, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • June 30, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 30, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 30, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 19, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.