U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tollis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2016: [Status Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 14, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 07, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 20, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 12, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • June 24, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 24, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 24, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 24, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.