U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alejandro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 21, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 21, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 09, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 04, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 14, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order]
  • July 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • June 24, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 24, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 24, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • June 24, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2015: [Bond]
  • June 24, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • June 24, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.