U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00096-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz-Gomez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • December 09, 2022: [Seal]
  • December 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • December 09, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
July, 2022
  • July 17, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 06, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 22, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 22, 2020: [Seal]
  • September 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 09, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 03, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 01, 2019: [Violation Report]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 24, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 23, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 20, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • September 20, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 14, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 13, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Continue ]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 10, 2018: [Leave to File]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 05, 2018: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2018: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • February 05, 2018: [Consent Form]
  • February 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • December 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2017: [Continue ]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Continue ]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Continue ]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 24, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 19, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 19, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 18, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 09, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 22, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 18, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 15, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 13, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 01, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 01, 2017: [Continue ]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Referring Plea]
  • January 27, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 24, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 23, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 19, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 07, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 01, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 15, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • November 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2016: [Departure]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • September 13, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • September 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 29, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • August 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 25, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 25, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 21, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 02, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • June 02, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • June 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 02, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • May 05, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • May 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 03, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Letter]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 18, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 06, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • April 04, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • March 30, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 30, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • March 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 23, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • March 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 03, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • February 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 28, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 28, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 28, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 28, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • December 28, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 28, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 28, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • November 16, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 04, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • September 24, 2015: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • September 17, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 17, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • July 02, 2015: [Speedy Trial]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.