U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 26, 2024: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 20, 2022: [Violation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • July 07, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 06, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 06, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 21, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 19, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 05, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 26, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 21, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 16, 2018: [Violation Report]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 17, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 06, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 03, 2017: [Violation Report]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 06, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 02, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 02, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 02, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 02, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Dismiss ]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 30, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Payment]
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 03, 2017: [Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 23, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 22, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Dismiss ]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • November 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 09, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 09, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 01, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 01, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 27, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • October 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 25, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • October 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • October 14, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 30, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • September 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 21, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 21, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • September 20, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 02, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 02, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 26, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 26, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • June 28, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 24, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • June 21, 2016: [Payment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 21, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2016: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • June 21, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Search Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2016: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • June 16, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Travel ]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 27, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 24, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 26, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 27, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 22, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 21, 2016: [Travel ]
  • January 20, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 15, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 07, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 04, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 28, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 28, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 28, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 10, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 20, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 19, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • November 17, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 03, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 03, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 02, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 29, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 29, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 29, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 27, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 27, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2015: [New Trial]
  • October 26, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 26, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 23, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • October 23, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Waiver of Ten-Day Notice]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • October 23, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 23, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 23, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 23, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 23, 2015: [Unseal Case]
  • October 23, 2015: [Waiver of Ten-Day Notice]
  • October 23, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 23, 2015: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • September 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 01, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 26, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order]
  • August 20, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • August 04, 2015: [Approve Associate Counsel]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • July 27, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • July 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 16, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • July 16, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • July 16, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order]
  • July 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 16, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 07, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 02, 2015: [Bond]
  • July 01, 2015: [Seal]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.