U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes-Batista
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Unseal Document]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Restitution Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Transcript]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 04, 2019: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 04, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 04, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 04, 2019: [Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 21, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continue ]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • June 14, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 13, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • June 13, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • June 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • June 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • June 12, 2019: [Acquittal]
  • June 11, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 04, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • June 03, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on ExParte Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 30, 2019: [Jury Selection]
  • May 29, 2019: [ExParte Motion]
  • May 23, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continue ]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2019: [Hearing ]
  • March 26, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2019: [Continue ]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue ]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • August 21, 2018: [Travel ]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 11, 2018: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 07, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 03, 2018: [Transcript]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2018: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • April 20, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 15, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • April 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • April 12, 2018: [Jury Selection]
  • April 10, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 23, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 23, 2018: [Strike ]
  • March 23, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 08, 2018: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • March 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 06, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • March 05, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Hearing ]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Bond]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Continue ]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Continue ]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • June 07, 2017: [Continue ]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 02, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • April 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 20, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 12, 2017: [Bond]
  • April 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2017: [Hearing ]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • November 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 23, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • November 22, 2016: [Indictment]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Bond]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 04, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 24, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Extension of Time]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Extension of Time]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Extension of Time]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 15, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order Returning Submission]
  • November 10, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • November 06, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Conference]
  • September 09, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 01, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 01, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 01, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.