U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Transcript]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 17, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 13, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 29, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 29, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 28, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 21, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 21, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 27, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 19, 2016: [Violation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 11, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 08, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 02, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 02, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order]
  • July 02, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • July 01, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.