U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 06, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2020: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 23, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Dismiss ]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 08, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 08, 2017: [Seal]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 29, 2016: [Seal]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Seal]
  • July 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 02, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Information - Felony]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 20, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2016: [Extension of Time]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.