U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 12, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 22, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 22, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • March 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2016: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 26, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 23, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 21, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 25, 2015: [Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 20, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.