U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pabian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 03, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 02, 2016: [Dismiss ]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • April 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 10, 2016: [Seal]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 22, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 22, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 22, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 08, 2015: [Indictment]
  • July 08, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.