U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Donaby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 29, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 25, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 10, 2018: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order of Transfer]
  • December 05, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [2255 Motion Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.