U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fothergill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 03, 2016: [Transcript]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 15, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • July 15, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.