U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. D'Auria
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2016
  • April 10, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 03, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 13, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 31, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • December 29, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 23, 2015: [Bond]
  • December 23, 2015: [Extension of Time]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 16, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 22, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 20, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 17, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 15, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 15, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • July 15, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 15, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 15, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 15, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2015: [Bond]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.