U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Reply to Response]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Returning Submission]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 18, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 18, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order Returning Submission]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2020: [ExParte Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 21, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Transcript]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 19, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 12, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 12, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • November 18, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 18, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 18, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 18, 2015: [Consent Form]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 05, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.