U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 19, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 20, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 20, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 04, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Indictment]
  • July 16, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.