U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Battle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 05, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 22, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [Transcript]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order]
  • September 03, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 22, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 22, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 22, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 22, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 22, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 16, 2015: [Indictment]
  • July 16, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.