U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Newton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 27, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 27, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order]
  • July 16, 2015: [Indictment]
  • July 16, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.