U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Transcript]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 25, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 11, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extension of Time]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 22, 2017: [Seal]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 18, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.